Global Patent Index - EP 1850076 A2

EP 1850076 A2 2007-10-31 - Refrigerant condenser equipped with receiver

Title (en)

Refrigerant condenser equipped with receiver

Title (de)

Kondensator mit integrietem Sammler

Title (fr)

Condenseur avec accumulateur intégré

Publication

EP 1850076 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07106157 A

Priority

JP 2006121843 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a refrigerant condenser (2) equipped with a receiver (3), in which the receiver (3) is disposed on a side surface of one header pipe (6) of the condenser (2) and the receiver (3) is connected to the header pipe (6) via a connection member (4) by brazing, wherein the connection member (4) is processed from a plate material, a pair of pipe portions (21, 22) for refrigerant passage are formed integrally on the connection member (4), tip parts of the pipe portions (21, 22) are inserted into holes formed on an object member of the header pipe (6) or the receiver (3), and a surface portion of the connection member (4) around each pipe portion (21, 22) present on a side opposite to a pipe portion projecting side is formed as a ring-like surface (25, 26) at a condition where holes (27, 28) or a hole (28) and a notch (29) are provided on both sides of the ring-like surface. The manufacture and assembly of the refrigerant condenser (2) equipped with a receiver can be facilitated by improving the structure of the pipe portions and the portions therearound of the connection member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0442 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850076 A2 20071031; EP 1850076 A3 20090805; JP 2007292401 A 20071108; JP 4726692 B2 20110720

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100206

2010-05-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU