Global Patent Index - EP 1850082 A1

EP 1850082 A1 2007-10-31 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1850082 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06113007 A

Priority

EP 06113007 A

Abstract (en)

A plate heat exchanger (44) with a symmetrical or asymmetrical plate design in one or more stages and for one or more circuits for use in preparing heat and/or hot water in buildings, which heat exchanger is adapted to transfer heat from a primary fluid circuit to at least one secondary fluid circuit. The heat exchanger includes a number of stacked plates provided with a pattern defining channels (48) for flows of said fluids is provided with at least one port for the primary fluid's and the secondary fluid's inflow and outflow, respectively. At least one port configuration of the heat exchanger and at least one, to the port, associated attachment means are arranged at least partly with a coaxial arrangement for a fluid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/04 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0246 (2013.01); F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28D 9/0093 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850082 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130516

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU