Global Patent Index - EP 1850271 A1

EP 1850271 A1 2007-10-31 - Method for video mode classification

Title (en)

Method for video mode classification

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Klassifizierung des Videomodus

Title (fr)

Procédé de classification de mode vidéo

Publication

EP 1850271 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07013135 A

Priority

EP 03001861 A

Abstract (en)

A method for video content classification is proposed, wherein said video comprises a sequence of images (I), each of said images (I) consisting of respective image data (ID), said method comprising: generating a feature vector (FV) based on said image data (ID), wherein said feature vector is descriptive of temporal and/or spatial features of at least one of said images (I); generating image content classification/identification data (ICCI) based on said feature vector (FV) and based on a trainable classification method; and classifying said video content based on said image content classification/identification data (ICCI).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/66 (2006.01); G06T 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/14 (2006.01); H04N 5/253 (2006.01); H04N 7/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00711 (2013.01); H04N 5/14 (2013.01); H04N 5/145 (2013.01); H04N 7/0115 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9524017 A2 19950908 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [Y] US 2002149703 A1 20021017 - ADAMS DALE R [US], et al
  • [Y] US 6064775 A 20000516 - SUZUKI NOBUO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5497196 A 19960305 - NISHIDA KAZUHITO [JP]
  • [A] US 2002140843 A1 20021003 - TRETTER DANIEL R [US], et al
  • [Y] WISCHERMANN G: "DAS DIGITALE WETGATE. DIE DRITTE NOISE-REDUCER-GENERATION VON PHILIPS BTS", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, DE, vol. 50, no. 7, 1 July 1996 (1996-07-01), pages 387 - 390, XP000623232, ISSN: 0015-0142
  • [Y] WILLIAMS C K I ET AL: "COMBINING BELIEF NETWORKS AND NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SCENE SEGMENTATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, vol. 24, no. 4, April 2002 (2002-04-01), pages 467 - 483, XP001144047, ISSN: 0162-8828

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1443453 A1 20040804; EP 1443453 B1 20071010; DE 60316768 D1 20071122; DE 60316768 T2 20080717; DE 60329241 D1 20091022; EP 1850271 A1 20071031; EP 1850271 B1 20090909

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60329241

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140129

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60329241

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100610

2009-10-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60329241 P 20091022

2009-09-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1443453 P

2009-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-09-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-04-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR VIDEO MODE CLASSIFICATION

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080502

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080331

2007-10-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1443453 P

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB