Global Patent Index - EP 1850298 A1

EP 1850298 A1 2007-10-31 - Network gaming system with bonus capability

Title (en)

Network gaming system with bonus capability

Title (de)

Netzwerkspielsystem mit Bonusmöglichkeit

Title (fr)

Système de jeu en réseau avec fonctionnalité de bonus

Publication

EP 1850298 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07106996 A

Priority

AU 2006902149 A

Abstract (en)

A bonus controller (207, 215) and method for controlling the award of a bonus at a gaming terminal (202). In one embodiment game play data is monitored and compared to a trigger event. A token is then sent to the triggering gaming terminal (202) dependent on any received response the bonus is immediately awarded, or data defining the bonus and a player identifier is stored to enable subsequent award of the bonus. In another embodiment, the method includes communicating a token over a wide area network (212) and checking whether the gaming terminal (202) is eligible to award the bonus.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3232 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3258 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850298 A1 20071031; AU 2007201857 A1 20071115; AU 2007201857 B2 20100218; AU 2009202708 A1 20090723; AU 2010201209 A1 20100415; AU 2010201209 B2 20120329; US 2007265066 A1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160810

2016-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160330

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080221

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU