Global Patent Index - EP 1850301 A1

EP 1850301 A1 2007-10-31 - Remote controller with narrowed acting angle

Title (en)

Remote controller with narrowed acting angle

Title (de)

Fernsteuerung mit reduziertem Wirkungswinkel

Title (fr)

Contrôleur à distance avec angle en fonction du rétrécissement

Publication

EP 1850301 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06290693 A

Priority

EP 06290693 A

Abstract (en)

An optical signal remote controller with narrowed acting angle having an optical signal emitter and a light guiding element used to narrow the acting angle of the optical signal emitted by the optical signal emitter is provided. The remote controller further includes a modulating apparatus, which move the light guiding element between a wide angle position and a narrow angle position to selectively narrow the acting angle. In the embodiments, a laser position indicator is also provided to indicate the targeting direction of acting angle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2013.01); G08C 2201/71 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850301 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101102

2008-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080321

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU