Global Patent Index - EP 1850308 A2

EP 1850308 A2 2007-10-31 - Adhesive label, release-sheet laminated adhesive label, and information reading method

Title (en)

Adhesive label, release-sheet laminated adhesive label, and information reading method

Title (de)

Klebeetikett, Schichtklebeetikett mit Abziehschicht und Informationsleseverfahren

Title (fr)

Étiquette adhésive, étiquette adhésive laminée à feuille de dégagement, et procédé de lecture d'informations

Publication

EP 1850308 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07106580 A

Priority

JP 2006119211 A

Abstract (en)

An adhesive label having a printing surface where information is printed using an ink which emits fluorescence due to the irradiation of excitation light, and to which excitation light is irradiated in order to read the information, including: a substrate for printing in which one surface is a printing surface; an adhesive layer which is provided on the other surface of the substrate for printing; a first light absorbing agent which absorbs excitation light; and a second light absorbing agent which absorbs light having a wavelength for detection in the fluorescence, is provided so that the information printed on the printing surface with a fluorescent ink can be read accurately.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 3/0294 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850308 A2 20071031; EP 1850308 A3 20090805; JP 2007292932 A 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU