Global Patent Index - EP 1850328 A1

EP 1850328 A1 2007-10-31 - Enhancement and extraction of formants of voice signals

Title (en)

Enhancement and extraction of formants of voice signals

Title (de)

Verstärkung und Extraktion von Sprachsignalformanten

Title (fr)

Renforcement et extraction de formants de signaux de parole

Publication

EP 1850328 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06013126 A

Priority

  • EP 06008675 A
  • EP 06013126 A

Abstract (en)

A method for extracting the formants of an audio signal comprises the following steps: a.) applying a frequency conversion on an audio signal in order to determine the envelope of the signal, b.) enhancing the formant tracks via filtering in the spectral domain.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/02 (2006.01); G10L 25/15 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0364 (2013.01); G10L 25/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 4820059 A 19890411 - MILLER JAMES D [US], et al
  • [X] US 2005165608 A1 20050728 - SUZUKI MASANAO [JP], et al
  • [X] EP 0742548 A2 19961113 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
  • [Y] US 4477925 A 19841016 - AVERY JAMES M [US], et al
  • [YA] EP 1600947 A2 20051130 - HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] US 6223151 B1 20010424 - KLEIJN WILLEM BASTIAAN [SE], et al
  • [A] US 2005197832 A1 20050908 - VANDALI ANDREW [AU], et al
  • [A] RAO P ET AL: "Speech formant frequency estimation: evaluating a nonstationary analysis method", SIGNAL PROCESSING, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 80, no. 8, August 2000 (2000-08-01), pages 1655 - 1667, XP004222586, ISSN: 0165-1684
  • [A] POTAMIANOS A ET AL: "Speech formant frequency and bandwidth tracking using multiband energy demodulation", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1995. ICASSP-95., 1995 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DETROIT, MI, USA 9-12 MAY 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, vol. 1, 9 May 1995 (1995-05-09), pages 784 - 787, XP010625350, ISBN: 0-7803-2431-5

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850328 A1 20071031; JP 2007293285 A 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080503

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU