Global Patent Index - EP 1850335 A2

EP 1850335 A2 2007-10-31 - Near field optical head and information recording/reading apparatus

Title (en)

Near field optical head and information recording/reading apparatus

Title (de)

Optischer Nahfeldkopf und Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen und Wiedergeben von Informationen

Title (fr)

Tête optique à champ proche et appareil d'enregistrement/de reproduction des informations

Publication

EP 1850335 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07075703 A

Priority

  • JP 2000173852 A
  • JP 2000371828 A
  • JP 2000379266 A
  • JP 2001126415 A
  • EP 01304917 A

Abstract (en)

The purpose of the application is to fabricate a near field optical head (1000) capable of recording and reading high density information at high speed with excellent mass production. In the application, stoppers (2) having almost the same height as that of a tip (1) of conical or pyramidal shape are disposed around the tip, a part of a pressing body (6) covering the tip and the stoppers is displaced by an external force, a part of the pressing body having displaced is allowed to come into contact with an opaque film (3) near the point of the tip and thereby an aperture is formed. According to a fabricating method of the application, multiple apertures can be formed in a block. Thus, the near field optical head is excellent in mass production and the formed aperture has a structure of high optical efficiency and high resolution. Therefore, the near field optical head capable of performing recording/reading in high density and at high speed can be fabricated in excellent mass production.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/00 (2006.01); B81B 1/00 (2006.01); G01Q 60/22 (2010.01); G01Q 80/00 (2010.01); G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 7/12 (2012.01); G11B 7/135 (2012.01); G11B 7/22 (2006.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/0937 (2013.01); G11B 7/122 (2013.01); G11B 7/124 (2013.01); G11B 7/1387 (2013.01); G11B 7/22 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); B82Y 20/00 (2013.01); G01Q 80/00 (2013.01); G11B 11/1058 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162605 A2 20011212; EP 1162605 A3 20030402; EP 1162605 B1 20071024; DE 60131046 D1 20071206; DE 60131046 T2 20080807; DE 60142995 D1 20101014; EP 1850335 A2 20071031; EP 1850335 A3 20080730; EP 1850335 B1 20100901; US 2002001283 A1 20020103; US 2006146683 A1 20060706; US 7032427 B2 20060425; US 7366060 B2 20080429

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60142995

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110606

2010-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60142995 P 20101014

2010-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1162605 P

2010-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-04-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-10-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1162605 P

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB