Global Patent Index - EP 1850357 A2

EP 1850357 A2 2007-10-31 - Position indication for an electric switchgear

Title (en)

Position indication for an electric switchgear

Title (de)

Schaltstellungsanzeige für eine elektrische Schaltanlage

Title (fr)

Indication de position pour installation de commutation électrique

Publication

EP 1850357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06025172 A

Priority

DE 102006019605 A

Abstract (en)

The display (7) has a mimic diagram of a part of an electrical switching system (1), and an indication of a switching condition of a switch (5) of the switching system in the mimic diagram. A clean mechanical coupling (9) is formed between the switch and the indication, which has switching symbols. The switch has a circuit-breaker (4), and a disconnecting switch and/or earthing switch, and the indication indicates a connection of an earthing process, when the earthing switch and the circuit breaker are closed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schaltstellungsanzeige (7, 7') für eine elektrische Schaltanlage (1), insbesondere für eine Mittel- oder Hochspannungsschaltanlage, umfassend ein Blindschaltbild zumindest eines Teils der Schaltanlage (1) und in dem Blindschaltbild eine Anzeige der Schaltstellung mindestens eines Schalters (4, 5) der Schaltanlage (1). Um eine sichere und zuverlässige Anzeige der Schalterstellung insbesondere auch bei Stromausfall zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, dass zwischen dem mindestens einen Schalter (4, 5) der Schaltanlage (1) und der Anzeige der Schaltstellung des mindestens einen Schalters (4, 5) eine rein mechanische Kopplung (9) ausgebildet ist. Die Anzeige der Schalterstellung umfasst vorzugsweise ein mechanisch betätigbares Schaltersymbol (8', 8", 8"', 8""). Die mechanische Koppelvorrichtung (9) ist vorzugsweise zwischen einem beweglichen Schaltelement (6', 6", 6"', 6"") eines der Schalter (4, 5) und dem entsprechenden Schaltersymbol (8', 8", 8''', 8"") der Anzeige (7, 7') ausgebildet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H02B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850357 A2 20071031; EP 1850357 A3 20080507; EP 1850357 B1 20170222; CN 101064418 A 20071031; DE 102006019605 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20171123

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006015362

2017-05-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2017-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2017-04-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006015362

2017-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2016-12-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2016-12-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STELTER, ACHIM

2016-12-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOEHM, GERRIT

2016-11-30 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161102

2016-11-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STELTER, ACHIM

2016-11-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOEHM, GERRIT

2016-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2013-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID GMBH

2012-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120618

2009-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2008-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU