Global Patent Index - EP 1850460 A2

EP 1850460 A2 2007-10-31 - Winding insulation applied with a single vacuum pressure impregnation

Title (en)

Winding insulation applied with a single vacuum pressure impregnation

Title (de)

Statorwicklungsisolierung mit einem einzigen Vakuumimprägnierungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Isolation d'enroulements avec une seule étape d'imprégnation sous vide

Publication

EP 1850460 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07003894 A

Priority

JP 2006121489 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is designed to provide an insulation coil with high insulation reliability using a dry mica tape, an integral impregnation coil and a mica tape for the electrical rotating machines using these coils, said mica tape having a long shelf life and capable of preventing run-off of the impregnating epoxy resin composition during curing, with the cured product of said epoxy resin composition being high in heat resistance. It is also envisaged to provide a single insulation coil using a mica tape containing epoxy adduct imidazole as an epoxy resin curing catalyst or a mica tape containing a mixture of epoxy adduct imidazole and zinc naphthenate. An integral impregnation coil made by using said insulation coil and an epoxy resin composition, and the electrical rotating machines using such coils are also provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 15/12 (2006.01); H01B 3/40 (2006.01); H02K 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 15/12 (2013.01); H01B 3/40 (2013.01); H02K 3/30 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2907 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2911 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850460 A2 20071031; EP 1850460 A3 20100804; EP 1850460 B1 20121031; JP 2007294702 A 20071108; JP 4893085 B2 20120307; US 2007252449 A1 20071101; US 8314342 B2 20121120

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-06-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150528 AND 20150603

2014-12-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD., JP

- Effective date: 20141124

2014-09-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD., YOKOHA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Effective date: 20121031

2014-09-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS, LTD., YOKOHA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., CHIYODA-KU, TOKYO 100-8280, JP

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-09-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Representative's name: PUSCHMANN BORCHERT BARDEHLE PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Representative's name: PUSCHMANN BORCHERT BARDEHLE PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

2013-11-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-12-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Effective date: 20121227

2012-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02K 15/12 20060101AFI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02K 3/30 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01B 3/40 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-01-20 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007026348

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H02K0003300000

- IPC: H02K0015120000

2011-10-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-04-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20101005

2010-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU