Global Patent Index - EP 1854521 A4

EP 1854521 A4 2009-02-18 - GO PLAYING SYSTEM

Title (en)

GO PLAYING SYSTEM

Title (de)

GO-SPIELSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE JEU DE GO

Publication

EP 1854521 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05726583 A

Priority

JP 2005003317 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1854521A1] A go playing system enabling the players to play go over a network. The system comprises player information storage means, dan/kyu grade information storage means, play processing means, point computing means for computins an increase/decrease of the points of each player according to the win or loss of the play with a basic point, point reporting means for reporting an increase or decrease of the points due to the win or loss to each player terminal, point updating means for storeing the new points corresponding to the win/loss in the player information storage means, dan/kyu grade changing meansa for changing the dan/kyu grade of the winner and the loser by comparing their points with the dan/kyu promotion point and dan/kyu demotion point, and dan/kyu grade reporting means for reporting the change of the dan/kyu grade to the player terminal used bgy the plyer if the dan/kyu grade of the player is changed by the dan/kyu grade changing means.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/12 (2006.01); G06Q 50/10 (2012.01); A63F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3276 (2013.01); G07F 17/3295 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No Search
  • See also references of WO 2006092839A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1854521 A1 20071114; EP 1854521 A4 20090218; CN 101132840 A 20080227; CN 101132840 B 20100512; JP 3993887 B2 20071017; JP WO2006092839 A1 20080724; KR 101046485 B1 20110704; KR 20070107719 A 20071107; US 2009036215 A1 20090205; WO 2006092839 A1 20060908

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1115085

2011-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101125

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090914

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090115

2008-11-21 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1115085

2008-06-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR