Global Patent Index - EP 1861479 A4

EP 1861479 A4 20121121 - DESULFURIZATION OF PETROLEUM STREAMS USING METALLIC SODIUM

Title (en)

DESULFURIZATION OF PETROLEUM STREAMS USING METALLIC SODIUM

Title (de)

ENTSCHWEFELUNG VON ERDÖLSTRÖMEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON METALLISCHEM NATRIUM

Title (fr)

DESULFURATION DE FLUX DE PETROLE AU MOYEN DE SODIUM METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1861479 A4 20121121 (EN)

Application

EP 05714149 A 20050304

Priority

US 2005006859 W 20050304

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006096160A2] The invention is a method of removing sulfur from a hydrocarbon feed using the steps of dissolving metallic sodium in a solvent and combining the sodium/solvent solution with a liquid hydrocarbon feed containing an organosulfur species. The pressure of combination is above the vapor pressure of the solvent. The combined hydrocarbon feed and solvent solution are placed in a low pressure environment to vaporize the solvent. The resulting stream is combined with hydrogen gas and this stream is heated and pressurized to form a liquid hydrocarbon product containing sodium sulfide. This product is then cooled, and the sodium sulfide is extracted.

IPC 8 full level

C10G 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C10G 19/073 (2013.01); C10G 29/04 (2013.01); C10G 2300/202 (2013.01); C10G 2300/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] JOHN G. VERKADE: "A NOVEL APPROACH TO CATALYTIC DESULFURIZATION OF COAL.", 30 November 2001 (2001-11-30), pages i - 42, XP002684814, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.osti.gov/bridge/servlets/purl/800760-btRiFp/native/800760.pdf>
  • [IY] ZHENGKUN YU ET AL.: "MILD AND EFFICIENT DESULFURIZATION OF ALKYL SULFIDES WITH SODIUM", TETHRAEDRON LETTERS, vol. 39, 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31), pages 2671 - 2674, XP002684815
  • [IY] ZHENGKUN YU ET AL.: "DESULFURIZATION OF ORGANOSULFUR COMPOUNDS WITH LITHIUM AND SODIUM", ENERGY AND FUELS, vol. 13, 18 December 1998 (1998-12-18), pages 23 - 28, XP002684816

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2006096160 A2 20060914; WO 2006096160 A3 20061221; CA 2600037 A1 20060914; EP 1861479 A2 20071205; EP 1861479 A4 20121121; MX 2007010847 A 20080121

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 2005006859 W 20050304; CA 2600037 A 20050304; EP 05714149 A 20050304; MX 2007010847 A 20050304