EP 1872134 A4 20100901 - REAGENTS FOR THE DETECTION OF PROTEIN PHOSPHORYLATION IN CARCINOMA SIGNALING PATHWAYS
Title (en)
REAGENTS FOR THE DETECTION OF PROTEIN PHOSPHORYLATION IN CARCINOMA SIGNALING PATHWAYS
Title (de)
REAGENTIEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON PROTEINPHOSPHORYLIERUNG IN KARZINOM-SIGNALWEGEN
Title (fr)
RÉACTIFS DE DÉTECTION DE PHOSPHORYLATION DE PROTÉINES DANS LA VOIE DE SIGNALISATION DE CARCINOME
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2006010868 W 20060324
- US 67044705 P 20050412
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2006113050A2] The invention discloses (214) novel phosphorylation sites identified in signal transduction proteins and pathways underlying human carcinoma, and provides phosphorylation-site specific antibodies and heavy-isotope labeled peptides (AQUA peptides) for the selective detection and quantification of these phosphorylated sites/proteins, as well as methods of using the reagents for such purpose. Among the phosphorylation sites identified are sites occurring in the following protein types: Adaptor/Scaffold proteins, Cytoskeleton proteins, GTP Signaling proteins, Kinases, Metabolism proteins, Phosphatases/Phospho- diesterases/ Proteases, Receptor proteins, RNA Processing proteins, Transcription proteins, Translation proteins, Transporter proteins, and Ubitquitin proteins, as well as other protein types.
IPC 8 full level
C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/44 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C07K 14/4748 (2013.01); C07K 16/44 (2013.01); G01N 33/57496 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] WO 9321230 A1 19931028 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]
- [A] US 2003108888 A1 20030612 - SCANLAN MATTHEW J [US], et al
- [A] WO 02081638 A2 20021017 - ORIGENE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al
- [XA] RUSH J ET AL: "Immunoaffinity profiling of tyrosine phosphorylation in cancer cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NBT1046, vol. 23, no. 1, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 94 - 101, XP002322741, ISSN: 1087-0156
- [A] MANDELL J W: "Phosphorylation state-specific antibodies: applications in investigative and diagnostic pathology", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INVESTIGATIVE PATHOLOGY, US, vol. 163, no. 5, 1 November 2003 (2003-11-01), pages 1687 - 1698, XP003017035, ISSN: 0002-9440
- [A] KANNER S B: "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO INDIVIDUAL TYROSINE-PHOSPHORYLATED PROTEIN SUBSTRATES OF ONCOGENE-ENCODED TYROSINE KINASES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1073/PNAS.87.9.3328, vol. 87, no. 9, 1 May 1990 (1990-05-01), pages 3328 - 3332, XP002002168, ISSN: 0027-8424
- [I] AMAR L S ET AL: "Involvement of desmoplakin phosphorylation in the regulation of desmosomes by protein kinase C, in HeLa cells.", CELL ADHESION AND COMMUNICATION 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10427965, vol. 7, no. 2, 1999, pages 125 - 138, XP008124497, ISSN: 1061-5385
- [X] CELL SIGNALING TECHNOLOGY: "PHospho-Tyrosine MOuse mAb (P-Tyr-100)", 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), XP002592671, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.cellsignal.com/pdf/9411.pdf> [retrieved on 20100719]
- See references of WO 2006113050A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2006113050 A2 20061026; WO 2006113050 A3 20081224; WO 2006113050 A4 20090326; WO 2006113050 A8 20071227; EP 1872134 A2 20080102; EP 1872134 A4 20100901
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2006010868 W 20060324; EP 06739581 A 20060324