Global Patent Index - EP 1872600 A4

EP 1872600 A4 2009-02-25 - SYSTEM AND MEHTOD FOR CONFIGURING AN RFID READER

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND MEHTOD FOR CONFIGURING AN RFID READER

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES RFID-LESERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONFIGURATION D'UN LECTEUR RFID

Publication

EP 1872600 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06751147 A

Priority

  • US 2006015343 W
  • US 67369205 P
  • US 71295705 P
  • US 30139605 A
  • US 30142305 A
  • US 30158705 A
  • US 30177005 A
  • US 32321405 A
  • US 32820906 A
  • US 38742106 A
  • US 38742206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006116084A2] A method for implementing a virtual tag in an RFID tag reading system. In one embodiment, data is read from the memory of an RFID tag and stored in tag cache memory. Commands intended for the tag are queued in the tag cache, and the commands queued in the tag cache are executed in response to occurrence of an event. A result is provided as if the command had been applied to the tag at the time of an initial request to send commands to the tag.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/087 (2013.01); G06Q 10/08 (2013.01); G06Q 50/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006116084 A2 20061102; WO 2006116084 A3 20071018; EP 1872308 A2 20080102; EP 1872594 A2 20080102; EP 1872594 A4 20090304; EP 1872599 A2 20080102; EP 1872599 A4 20090114; EP 1872600 A2 20080102; EP 1872600 A4 20090225; EP 1872601 A2 20080102; EP 1872601 A4 20090304; EP 1872602 A2 20080102; WO 2006116085 A2 20061102; WO 2006116085 A3 20070426; WO 2006116235 A2 20061102; WO 2006116235 A3 20070823; WO 2006116236 A2 20061102; WO 2006116236 A3 20070118; WO 2006116237 A2 20061102; WO 2006116237 A3 20070322; WO 2006116238 A2 20061102; WO 2006116238 A3 20070322

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090807

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2008-07-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKYETEK, INC.

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOVING, SEAN

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAN, CHRISTOPHER

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJHI, ROHIT

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENWALL, TIM

2008-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071109

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR