Global Patent Index - EP 1874647 A4

EP 1874647 A4 2009-02-18 - RECEPTACLE FOR A CAP CLOSURE

Title (en)

RECEPTACLE FOR A CAP CLOSURE

Title (de)

AUFNAHME FÜR EINEN KAPPENVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

RECEPTACLE POUR FERMETURE A BOUCHON

Publication

EP 1874647 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06733178 A

Priority

  • NZ 2006000090 W
  • NZ 53621705 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006115425A2] An upper cap 1 has a thread 5 to engage with a thread 7 of a container cap closure 6. The upper cap 1 provides a receptacle in which any required commodity can be contained such as a novelty car as shown. Clockwise or counter-clockwise rotation of the cap 1, shown as 2 or 3, can selectively remove the cap 1 without or with the cap 6. A plurality of caps 1 may be connected together to form a vertical stack.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006115425 A2 20061102; WO 2006115425 A3 20061214; AU 2006240571 A1 20061102; AU 2006240571 B2 20110106; BR PI0611157 A2 20100817; CA 2604708 A1 20061102; CN 100551786 C 20091021; CN 101166674 A 20080423; EP 1874647 A2 20080109; EP 1874647 A4 20090218; HK 1116456 A1 20100611; JP 2008539139 A 20081113; MX 2007013204 A 20071211; NZ 536217 A 20071130; US 2009294452 A1 20091203

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120412

2011-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MELROSE, DAVID MURRAY

2011-11-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 51/28 20060101AFI20111013BHEP

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090116

2008-08-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR