Global Patent Index - EP 1876616 A3

EP 1876616 A3 2009-02-25 - Reset device for limit switch and limit switch incorporating such device

Title (en)

Reset device for limit switch and limit switch incorporating such device

Title (de)

Rücksetzungsvorrichtung für einen Begrenzungsschalter und Begrenzungsschalter mit einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réinitialisation et interrupteur de fin de course incorporant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1876616 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07012965 A

Priority

IT VI20060211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1876616A2] The present invention generally finds application in the field of safety electric devices and relates to a reset device to be coupled to a limit switch (2), which comprises a modular housing (14), interface means (18) associated to said housing for removable coupling both to the head (4) and to the case (3) of the limit switch (2), reset means (13) at least partly accommodated in said housing (14) for controlled turning on and off of the limit switch (2). The reset means have such a shape as to interact with the actuator means of the switch to promote positive opening of the electric contacts substantially at the same time as the switch with which the device is associated is turned on/off.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/68 (2006.01); H01H 21/28 (2006.01); H01H 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0018 (2013.01); H01H 13/68 (2013.01); H01H 21/28 (2013.01); H01H 3/20 (2013.01); H01H 2003/024 (2013.01); H01H 2021/287 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1876616 A2 20080109; EP 1876616 A3 20090225; EP 1876616 B1 20110914; IT VI20060211 A1 20080108

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170802

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-10-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007017106

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120615

2011-11-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007017106

- Effective date: 20111110

2011-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2011-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 11/00 20060101AFI20090121BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 13/68 20060101ALI20090121BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 21/28 20060101ALI20090121BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 3/20 20060101ALN20090121BHEP

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU