Global Patent Index - EP 1879906 A4

EP 1879906 A4 2009-07-22 - REVERSIBLE NUCLEOTIDE TERMINATORS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

REVERSIBLE NUCLEOTIDE TERMINATORS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

UMKEHRBARE NUKLEOTIDTERMINATOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON

Title (fr)

TERMINATEURS NUCLEOTIDIQUES REVERSIBLES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1879906 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06733635 A

Priority

  • US 2006000432 W
  • US 64154905 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074351A2] The present invention provides nucleotide analogs which are useful in one or more DNA sequencing techniques.

IPC 8 full level

C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 19/02 (2006.01); C07H 19/06 (2006.01); C07H 19/16 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC

C07H 19/20 (2013.01); C07H 19/073 (2013.01); C07H 19/10 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6869 (2013.01)

C-Set

C12Q 1/6869 + C12Q 2565/102 + C12Q 2537/157 + C12Q 2535/101

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 10214395 A1 20031023 - TCHERKASSOV DMITRI [DE], et al
  • [X] WO 9529930 A2 19951109 - GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]
  • [X] US 6087482 A 20000711 - TENG KELLY [US], et al
  • [Y] US 2003104437 A1 20030605 - BARNES COLIN [GB], et al
  • [Y] WO 0125247 A1 20010412 - QUIATECH AB [SE], et al
  • [A] US 6613513 B1 20030902 - PARCE J WALLACE [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9623807 A1 19960808 - KWIATKOWSKI MAREK [SE]
  • [A] WO 03048387 A2 20030612 - SOLEXA LTD [GB], et al
  • [X] SUN S ET AL: "Synthesis of 3'- thioribonucleosides and their incorporation into oligoribonucleotides via phosphoramidite chemistry", RNA, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, vol. 3, no. 11, 1 January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 1352 - 1363, XP002337182, ISSN: 1355-8382
  • [X] LI, XIANG ET AL: "Synthesis of a dinucleoside 3'-S-phosphorothiolate containing 2'-deoxy-3'-thioadenosine", TETRAHEDRON , 48(13), 2729-38 CODEN: TETRAB; ISSN: 0040-4020, 1992, XP002529711
  • [X] LIN, KUEI YING ET AL: "Oligodeoxynucleotides containing 5-(1-propynyl)-2'-deoxyuridine formacetal and thioformacetal dimer synthons", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS , 4(8), 1061-4 CODEN: BMCLE8; ISSN: 0960-894X, 1994, XP002529713
  • [X] MATULIC-ADAMIC, JASENKA ET AL: "A practical synthesis of 3'-thioguanosine and of its 3'-phosphoramidothioite (a thiophosphoramidite)", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA , 82(12), 2141-2150 CODEN: HCACAV; ISSN: 0018-019X, 1999, XP002529714
  • [X] EL-BARBARY A A ET AL: "Convergent synthesis of 2',3'-dideoxy-3'-mercapto nucleosides - potential anti-HIV agents", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, SPRINGER VERLAG. WIEN, AT, vol. 125, no. 8-9, 1 January 1994 (1994-01-01), pages 1017 - 1025, XP002476189, ISSN: 0026-9247
  • [X] WOJCZEWSKI, CHRISTIAN ET AL: "Synthesis of 3'-S-(2-aminoethylthio)-3'-deoxythymidine 5'-triphosphates", SYNTHESIS , (1), 149-153 CODEN: SYNTBF; ISSN: 0039-7881, 2000, XP002529715
  • [X] SPECHT A ET AL: "p-Hydroxyphenacyl bromide as photoremoveable thiol label: a potential phototrigger for thiol-containing biomolecules", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, vol. 43, no. 49, 2 December 2002 (2002-12-02), pages 8947 - 8950, XP004391872, ISSN: 0040-4039
  • [X] ROBINS MORRIS J ET AL: "Synthesis of 2'-deoxytubercidin {4-amino-7-(2-deoxy-.beta.-D-erythro- pentofuranosyl)pyrrolo[2,3-d]pyrimidine} from the parent antibiotic", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, no. 7, 1 January 1976 (1976-01-01), pages 269, XP009117309, ISSN: 0022-4936
  • [X] DUEHOLM, KIM L. ET AL: "Synthesis of 3'-alkylthio-2',3'-dideoxy nucleosides with potential anti-HIV activity from 2-deoxy-D-ribose, using a phosphorus pentoxide reagent.", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE (WEINHEIM, GERMANY) , 325(9), 597-601 CODEN: ARPMAS; ISSN: 0365-6233, 1992, XP002529717
  • [X] ANDERSON, CHARLES D. ET AL: "Potential anticancer agents. XIX. Synthesis of 2-deoxyadenosine", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 81, 3967-74 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, 1959, XP002529718
  • [X] ZUCKERMANN R ET AL: "EFFICIENT METHODS FOR ATTACHMENT OF THIOL SPECIFIC PROBES TO THE 3'-ENDS OF SYNTHETIC OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 15, no. 13, 10 July 1987 (1987-07-10), pages 5305 - 5321, XP002061832, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [X] ZHANG J ET AL: "Synthesis and hybridization property of an oligonucleotide containing a 3'-thioformacetal linked pentathymidylate", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 9, no. 3, 8 February 1999 (1999-02-08), pages 319 - 322, XP004157221, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • [PA] RUPAREL H ET AL: "Design and synthesis of a 3 '-O-allyl photocleavable fluorescent nucleotide as a reversible terminator for DNA sequencing by synthesis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, vol. 102, no. 17, 1 April 2005 (2005-04-01), pages 5932 - 5937, XP002454222, ISSN: 0027-8424

DCS

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family

WO 2006074351 A2 20060713; WO 2006074351 A3 20070118; EP 1879906 A2 20080123; EP 1879906 A4 20090722; JP 2008526877 A 20080724