EP 1880335 A1 20080123 - GENE-BASED ALGORITHMIC CANCER PROGNOSIS
Title (en)
GENE-BASED ALGORITHMIC CANCER PROGNOSIS
Title (de)
ALGORITHMISCHE KREBSPROGNOSE AUF GENBASIS
Title (fr)
PRONOSTIC ALGORITHMIQUE DU CANCER BASE SUR LES GENES GENE-BASED ALGORITHMIC CANCER PROGNOSIS
Publication
Application
Priority
- BE 2006000051 W 20060515
- US 68054305 P 20050513
- EP 05447274 A 20051207
- EP 06752698 A 20060515
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2006119593A1] The present invention is related to The methods and systems for prognosis determination in tumor samples, by measuring gene expression in a tumor sample and applying a gene-expression grade index (GGI) or a relapse score (RS) to yield a numerical risk score.
IPC 8 full level
G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/20 (2011.01); G16B 25/10 (2019.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61P 35/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2017.12 - EP); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01 - EP); G01N 33/574 (2013.01 - EP); G16B 25/10 (2019.01 - EP US); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01 - EP); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01 - EP); C12Q 2600/118 (2013.01 - EP); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2006119593A1
Citation (examination)
- WO 2005033699 A2 20050414 - NCC TECHNOLOGY VENTURES PTE LT [SG], et al
- SOTIRIOU CHRISTOS ET AL: "Breast cancer classification and prognosis based on gene expression profiles from a population-based study", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 100, no. 18, 2 September 2003 (2003-09-02), pages 10393 - 10398, XP002528255, ISSN: 0027-8424, DOI: 10.1073/PNAS.1732912100
- WANG Y ET AL: "Gene-expression profiles to predict distant metastasis of lymph-node-negative primary breast cancer", THE LANCET, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, vol. 365, no. 9460, 19 February 2005 (2005-02-19), pages 671 - 679, XP027763936, ISSN: 0140-6736, [retrieved on 20050219]
- "Table 7. Genes that discriminate high (III) to low (I+II) grade breast tumors", 20130724, 24 July 2013 (2013-07-24), pages 1, XP007922104
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2006119593 A1 20061116; AU 2006246241 A1 20061116; CA 2608643 A1 20061116; CN 101356532 A 20090128; CN 101356532 B 20120801; EP 1880335 A1 20080123; JP 2008539737 A 20081120
DOCDB simple family (application)
BE 2006000051 W 20060515; AU 2006246241 A 20060515; CA 2608643 A 20060515; CN 200680016409 A 20060515; EP 06752698 A 20060515; JP 2008510367 A 20060515