Global Patent Index - EP 1882262 B1

EP 1882262 B1 2009-02-25 - ELECTRIC CONNECTING DEVICE FOR INSERTING A MALE PLUG CONNECTOR OF AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT SUCH AS A FUSE OR RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CONNECTING DEVICE FOR INSERTING A MALE PLUG CONNECTOR OF AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT SUCH AS A FUSE OR RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN EINES STECKVERBINDERS EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN KOMPONENTE, WIE Z.B. EINER SICHERUNG ODER EINES RELAIS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE POUR L'INSERTION D'UNE FICHE MALE DE CONNEXION D'UN COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE TEL QUE FUSIBLE OU RELAIS

Publication

EP 1882262 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 06753664 A

Priority

  • EP 2006004640 W
  • US 68209205 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006122765A1] The invention relates to an electric connecting device for inserting a male plug connector of an electronic component such as a fuse or relay, constituted of a strip of electrically conductive material having: a central portion (3) in which an opening (6) is made for inserting the male plug connector and is symmetric on both sides of said central portion; two longitudinal portions (4, 5) each comprising an intermediate insertion section (9), in which a contact blade (10) is formed that is delimited by a cut-out (11 13), and; a terminal section (24, 25) for being plugged into a support. In addition, this strip of material is folded to form, on the one hand, a parallelepiped cage delimited by the central portion (3) and by the two intermediate insertion sections (9) that conform in such a manner that their contact blades (10) each have a contact area for a male plug connector inserted into the cage and, on the other hand, a pluggable section in a support constituted of two terminal sections (24, 25) placed against one another.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/203 (2013.01); H01R 12/58 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01); H01H 2085/2085 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006122765 A1 20061123; CN 101111916 A 20080123; CN 101111916 B 20101222; DE 602006005353 D1 20090409; EP 1882262 A1 20080130; EP 1882262 B1 20090225; US 2008146088 A1 20080619; US 7654874 B2 20100202

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100517

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006005353 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE FRANCE

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE

2008-07-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT