Global Patent Index - EP 1882429 B1

EP 1882429 B1 2009-02-11 - Child's high chair

Title (en)

Child's high chair

Title (de)

Kinderhochstuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise haute pour enfant

Publication

EP 1882429 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 07109291 A

Priority

DE 202006011540 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE202006011540U1] The chair has feet (1, 2) and parallel frame parts (3, 4) which carry plates (11, 12). The parts are provided for the seat face screen end plate. The parts are evenly arranged on a front border with separated slots (19a, 19b, 19c). The seat face screen end plate and or the foot setting up surface define the plate having two sections (16a, 16b, 17a, 17b). The first section has a width which is smaller than the distance between the inner surfaces of the frame parts, while the second section has a width which is the same or more than the external distance between the frame parts.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 1/004 (2013.01); A47D 1/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006011540 U1 20060928; DE 502007000429 D1 20090326; EP 1882429 A1 20080130; EP 1882429 B1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007000429 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080104

2008-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU