Global Patent Index - EP 1884613 A3

EP 1884613 A3 2009-02-25 - Positioning hinge with positioning device

Title (en)

Positioning hinge with positioning device

Title (de)

Rastscharnier mit Rastvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Charnière à encliquetage dotée d'un dispositif d'encliquetage

Publication

EP 1884613 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07113640 A

Priority

DE 202006011852 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1884613A2] The latching hinge (10) has first (12) and second (14) band parts joined together so as to be able to pivot about a hinge axis and a latching body in the form of an eccentric body (38) pivotably mounted about a swing axis (42) on a second band part, whereby the sawing axis is arranged at a distance from a main axis (46) and at right angles to the main axis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/1064 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006011852 U1 20071213; EP 1884613 A2 20080206; EP 1884613 A3 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU