Global Patent Index - EP 1884853 B1

EP 1884853 B1 2009-02-04 - Hydraulic control valve and electrohydraulic clamping device

Title (en)

Hydraulic control valve and electrohydraulic clamping device

Title (de)

Hydraulik-Regelventil und elektrohydraulische Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Vanne de commande hydraulique et dispositif de serrage electrohydraulique

Publication

EP 1884853 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06016027 A

Priority

EP 06016027 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1884853A1] The valve (R) has a control spring (11) loading a valve unit (10) and supported at a spring thrust bearing (12). The thrust bearing is hydraulically adjustable between two mechanically determined control spring-clamping positions by using a setting piston (13), where the positions are assigned to higher and lower control spring-clamping. The piston is fixed to a connecting rod by using a clamping unit, and is arranged in a control chamber that is provided in a spring housing (18), where the control chamber is connected with a pressure connection of an outer housing.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05D 16/16 (2006.01); B25B 5/06 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01); G05D 16/10 (2006.01); G05D 16/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/061 (2013.01); F15B 11/028 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3116 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50554 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5151 (2013.01); F15B 2211/528 (2013.01); F15B 2211/57 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CZ DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1884853 A1 20080206; EP 1884853 B1 20090204; AT 422255 T 20090215; DE 502006002776 D1 20090319

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 422255 T

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006002776

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-10-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002776 P 20090319

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR IT

2009-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAWE HYDRAULIK SE

2008-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE FR IT

2008-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070130

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU