Global Patent Index - EP 1886136 A4

EP 1886136 A4 2010-02-03 - SYSTEM FOR RAPID ANALYSIS OF MICROBIOLOGICAL MATERIALS IN LIQUID SAMPLES

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR RAPID ANALYSIS OF MICROBIOLOGICAL MATERIALS IN LIQUID SAMPLES

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR SCHNELLANALYSE MIKROBIOLOGISCHER MATERIALIEN IN FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ANALYSE RAPIDE DE MATIERES MICROBIOLOGIQUES DANS DES ECHANTILLONS LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1886136 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05741372 A

Priority

CA 2005000686 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006116835A1] A system for the rapid analysis of microbiological parameters includes a specimen container for containing a liquid sample, a housing having an enclosable chamber shaped for receiving the specimen container, an incubating system mounted within the housing for incubating microbiological materials within the liquid sample, and a spectrophotometer system mounted within the housing for measuring light absorbed, emitted or scattered by the liquid samples as the microbiological materials are incubated by the incubating system over time. The specimen container is filled with a liquid sample to be tested and mixed with a reagent that provides a detectable parameter, and placed inside the apparatus. The incubation system heats and maintains the temperature of the liquid sample within a preset range while the spectrophotometer system propagates light within the specimen container, and monitors and records changes in the light as the light propagates through the container. A continuous non-intrusive monitoring and recording of the test parameter is achieved as the incubation progresses. Any significant deviation of the signal output is an indication of presence of the detectable parameter, while the time taken to reach the significant deviation provides quantification of the microbiological parameter under investigation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); C12M 1/34 (2006.01); G01N 21/01 (2006.01); G01N 21/31 (2006.01); G01N 21/47 (2006.01); G01N 21/62 (2006.01); G01N 21/94 (2006.01); G01N 33/18 (2006.01); G01N 33/483 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/04 (2013.01); G01N 21/03 (2013.01); G01N 21/31 (2013.01); G01N 21/51 (2013.01); G01N 21/532 (2013.01); G01N 21/6428 (2013.01); G01N 21/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006116835 A1 20061109; WO 2006116835 A8 20071213; AU 2005331515 A1 20061109; CA 2607086 A1 20061109; CA 2607086 C 20151117; CN 101218507 A 20080709; EA 012956 B1 20100226; EA 200702418 A1 20080630; EP 1886136 A1 20080213; EP 1886136 A4 20100203; IL 187064 D0 20080209; MX 2007013637 A 20080408

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110711

2010-02-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100108

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/48 20060101AFI20061129BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/94 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/31 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/47 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/62 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 21/01 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/18 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/483 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12M 1/34 20060101ALI20091230BHEP

2008-08-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR