Global Patent Index - EP 1886598 B1

EP 1886598 B1 2009-02-11 - Desk and office construction system

Title (en)

Desk and office construction system

Title (de)

Tisch- und Bürobausystem

Title (fr)

Système de construction de table et de bureau

Publication

EP 1886598 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 07110730 A

Priority

  • JP 2006219183 A
  • JP 2006308514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1886598A1] The present invention provides desks with which layout can be changed easily and accurately without disturbing the order of a work space and an entire office, the desk including a base (2) extending in a predetermined direction, a movable supporting member (4) supported so as to be movable along the base, and a top board (5a) supported by the movable supporting member so as to be turnable in the horizontal direction.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 83/001 (2013.01); A47B 87/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1886598 A1 20080213; EP 1886598 B1 20090211; DE 602007000531 D1 20090326; JP 2008062010 A 20080321; US 2008035031 A1 20080214

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120621

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007000531

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120621

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007000531 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMANISHI, MANABU

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IWAMURO, HIROMI

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORITA, KOJI

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FURUTA, TSUKASA

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU