Global Patent Index - EP 1887565 A1

EP 1887565 A1 2008-02-13 - Method and device for detecting a watermarking identifier in an audio signal

Title (en)

Method and device for detecting a watermarking identifier in an audio signal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung eines Wasserzeichen in einem Audiosignal

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de détection d'un identificateur de tatouage dans un signal audio

Publication

EP 1887565 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07301153 A

Priority

FR 0652919 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves preparing a current block of samples from a digitally tattooed audio signal, and calculating a correlation by a hadamard type or Fourier transform type rapid transformation method, between the samples of the block and a random sequence that is obtained from an initialization key. Correlation values of a specific number of the samples are compared to a predetermined threshold. The preparation, calculation and comparison operations are performed with another block that is shifted by the number of samples. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a device for detecting a tattooing identifier in an audio signal (2) a computer program comprising code instructions for implementation of a method for detecting a digital tattooing identifier in an audio signal.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé et un dispositif de détection d'un identificateur de tatouage dans un signal audio. Le procédé de l'invention met en oeuvre une méthode de recouvrement par bloc pour effectuer un calcul de corrélation par une méthode de transformation rapide. Les valeurs de corrélation obtenues sont comparées à un seuil pour détecter le début d'un identificateur de tatouage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2013.01); G10L 19/018 (2013.01); G10L 25/06 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/018 (2013.01); G10L 25/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • WO 2004010376 A1 20040129 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al
  • PARASKEVI BASSIA ET AL.: "Robust Audio Watermarking in The Time Domain", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, vol. 3, no. 2, June 2001 (2001-06-01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 1837875 A1 20070926 - THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]
  • [A] WO 9837513 A1 19980827 - TELSTRA R & D MAN PTY LTD [AU], et al
  • [A] US 6983057 B1 20060103 - HO ANTHONY TUNG SHUEN [SG], et al
  • [A] EP 1594122 A1 20051109 - THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]
  • [A] WO 0249363 A1 20020620 - KENT RIDGE DIGITAL LABS [SG], et al
  • [DA] WO 2004010376 A1 20040129 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al
  • [X] PARASKEVI BASSIA ET AL: "Robust Audio Watermarking in the Time Domain", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 3, no. 2, June 2001 (2001-06-01), XP011036241, ISSN: 1520-9210
  • [A] BARAS C ET AL: "An Audio Spread-Spectrum Data Hiding System with an Informed Embedding Strategy Adapted to a Wiener Filtering Based Receiver", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2005. ICME 2005. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS 06-06 JULY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 6 July 2005 (2005-07-06), pages 1022 - 1025, XP010843215, ISBN: 0-7803-9331-7
  • [A] MUNTEAN T ET AL: "Audio digital watermarking based on hybrid spread spectrum", WEB DELIVERING OF MUSIC, 2002. WEDELMUSIC 2002. PROCEEDINGS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 9-11 DEC. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 9 December 2002 (2002-12-09), pages 150 - 155, XP010626956, ISBN: 0-7695-1623-8
  • [A] KIROVSKI D ET AL: "SPREAD-SPECTRUM WATERMARKING OF AUDIO SIGNALS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 51, no. 4, April 2003 (2003-04-01), pages 1020 - 1033, XP001171826, ISSN: 1053-587X
  • [A] CVEJIC N AND SEPPANEN T: "IMPROVING AUDIO WATERMARKING SCHEME USING PSYCHOACOUSTIC WATERMARK FILTERING", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SIGNAL PROCESSING AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, CAIRO, EGYPT, 28 December 2001 (2001-12-28) - 30 December 2001 (2001-12-30), XP008078163
  • [A] HADDAD MOHSEN ET AL: "OPTIMAL DETECTOR FOR AN ADDITIVE WATERMARKING SCHEME BASED ON HUMAN AUDITORY SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, vol. 6072, 17 February 2006 (2006-02-17), pages 60721Z - 1, XP008078028, ISSN: 0277-786X
  • [DA] ALRUTZ AND M R SCHROEDER H: "A FAST HADAMARD TRANSFORM ALGORITHM FOR THE EVALUATION OF MEASUREMENTS USING PSEUDORANDOM TEST SIGNALS", ICA. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ACOUSTICS, XX, XX, no. 11TH, 1983, pages 235 - 238, XP008075716

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

DOCDB simple family

EP 1887565 A1 20080213