Global Patent Index - EP 1889669 A4

EP 1889669 A4 2009-02-25 - DRAWING ROLLING METHOD BY MANDREL MILL

Title (en)

DRAWING ROLLING METHOD BY MANDREL MILL

Title (de)

ZIEHWALZVERFAHREN FÜR ROHRWALZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ETIRAGE-LAMINAGE PAR UN LAMINOIR A MANDRIN

Publication

EP 1889669 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06730240 A

Priority

  • JP 2006306292 W
  • JP 2005090432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1889669A1] An elongation rolling method of a mother tube from a hollow shell using a mandrel mill can prevent overfilling and under-filling using a single combination of grooved roll. The outer diameter of the hollow shell is set such that the ratio of outer circumference of the hollow shell to outer circumference of the mother tube on the exit side of the finishing stand is at least 1.1 when the mother tube contains at least 10% Cr or the ratio is less than 1.1 when the mother tube contains less than 10% Cr. The groove profile of grooved rolls provided in a first stand and a second stand of the mandrel mill is set such that the groove circumference determined by a plurality of grooved rolls provided in the first stand satisfies Equation 1, the groove circumference determined by a plurality of grooved rolls provided in the second stand satisfies Equation 2, and the groove circumferences in the first stand and the second stand satisfy Equation 3. Under these conditions, elongation rolling of a mother tube is carried out using a mandrel mill.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/04 (2006.01); B21B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/04 (2013.01); B21B 3/02 (2013.01); B21B 27/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1889669 A1 20080220; EP 1889669 A4 20090225; EP 1889669 B1 20101229; BR PI0609266 A2 20100309; CN 101151107 A 20080326; CN 101151107 B 20100811; DE 602006019242 D1 20110210; JP 2006272340 A 20061012; JP 4441912 B2 20100331; RU 2357815 C1 20090610; WO 2006104146 A1 20061005

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Representative's name: ZIMMERMANN & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Representative's name: ZIMMERMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Representative's name: ZIMMERMANN & PARTNER, DE

2013-12-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20131108

2012-01-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-02-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006019242

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006019242 P 20110210

2010-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090126

2008-07-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2008-07-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT