Global Patent Index - EP 1892491 A3

EP 1892491 A3 2009-02-18 - Unit with a gas cooler and inner heat exchanger and heat exchanger

Title (en)

Unit with a gas cooler and inner heat exchanger and heat exchanger

Title (de)

Einheit, aufweisend einen Gaskühler und einen inneren Wärmetauscher, und Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Unité, comportant un refroidisseur de gaz et un échangeur thermique interne, et échangeur thermique

Publication

EP 1892491 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07013144 A

Priority

DE 102006032570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1892491A2] The heat exchanger unit has a heat exchanger (1) e.g. gas cooler, for transferring heat from a cooling medium to air or to another medium flowing through the heat exchanger. An internal heat exchanger (5) is formed as a structural unit and is arranged with the heat exchanger in a plane in a laterally shifted and spaced and/or thermally insulated manner. The internal heat exchanger is directly connected or soldered with the heat exchanger over a connecting cable (10) for formation of the structural unit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F28D 1/0461 (2013.01); F28D 7/106 (2013.01); F28D 7/1684 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2500/18 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0073 (2013.01); F28F 9/02 (2013.01); F28F 2255/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1892491 A2 20080227; EP 1892491 A3 20090218; DE 102006032570 A1 20080207

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/04 20060101AFI20080118BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 1/02 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 7/10 20060101ALI20090113BHEP

2008-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU