EP 1893639 A2 20080305 - NOVEL CYSTEINE-DEPLETED HYDROPHOBIN FUSION PROTEINS, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF
Title (en)
NOVEL CYSTEINE-DEPLETED HYDROPHOBIN FUSION PROTEINS, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF
Title (de)
NEUE CYSTEIN-VERARMTE HYDROPHOBINFUSIONSPROTEINE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG
Title (fr)
NOUVELLES PROTEINES DE FUSION DE TYPE HYDROPHOBINES APPAUVRIES EN CYSTEINE, LEUR PRODUCTION, ET LEUR UTILISATION
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 2006063066 W 20060609
- DE 102005027139 A 20050610
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2006131564A2] The invention relates to polypeptides of general structural formula (I) X<SUB>n</SUB>-C<SUP>1</SUP>-X<SUB>1-50</SUB>-C<SUP>2</SUP>-X<SUB>0-5</SUB>-C<SUP>3</SUP>-X<SUB>P</SUB>-C<SUP>4</SUP>-X<SUB>1-100</SUB>-C<SUP>5</SUP>-X<SUB>1-50</SUB>-C<SUP>6</SUP>-X<SUB>0-5</SUB>-C<SUP>7</SUP>-X<SUB>1-50</SUB>-C<SUP>8</SUP>-X<SUB>m</SUB>, to their production and use thereof.
IPC 8 full level
C07K 14/37 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C07K 14/37 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (examination)
- NAKARI-SETALA T ET AL: "Expression of a fungal hydrophobin in the Saccharomyces cerevisiae cell wall: Effect on cell surface properties and immobilization", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 68, no. 7, 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01), pages 3385 - 3391, XP002319522, ISSN: 0099-2240, DOI: 10.1128/AEM.68.7.3385-3391.2002
- W\STEN H A B ET AL: "Interfacial self-assembly of a fungal hydrophobin into a hydrophobic rodlet layer", THE PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT BIOLOGISTS, US, vol. 5, no. 11, 1 November 1993 (1993-11-01), pages 1567 - 1574, XP002976225, ISSN: 1040-4651, DOI: 10.1105/TPC.5.11.1567
- WOESTEN H A B ET AL: "THE FUNGAL HYDROPHOBIN SC3P SELF-ASSEMBLIES AT THE SURFACE OF AERIAL HYPHAE AS A PROTEIN MEMBRANE CONSTITUTING THE HYDROPHOBIC RODLET LAYER", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, WISSENSCHAFLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, STUTTGART, DE, vol. 63, 1 January 1994 (1994-01-01), pages 122 - 129, XP008065983, ISSN: 0171-9335
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2006131564 A2 20061214; WO 2006131564 A3 20070607; CA 2611234 A1 20061214; CN 101193911 A 20080604; CN 101193911 B 20130612; DE 102005027139 A1 20061228; EP 1893639 A2 20080305; JP 2008545435 A 20081218; JP 5302676 B2 20131002; US 2009136996 A1 20090528; US 7910699 B2 20110322
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2006063066 W 20060609; CA 2611234 A 20060609; CN 200680020577 A 20060609; DE 102005027139 A 20050610; EP 06763632 A 20060609; JP 2008515224 A 20060609; US 92190506 A 20060609