Global Patent Index - EP 1895246 A3

EP 1895246 A3 2009-02-11 - Refrigeration circuit and method for operating a refrigeration circuit

Title (en)

Refrigeration circuit and method for operating a refrigeration circuit

Title (de)

Kältekreislauf und Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kältekreislaufs

Title (fr)

Circuit frigorifique et procédé de fonctionnement d'un circuit frigorifique

Publication

EP 1895246 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07020311 A

Priority

  • EP 05775838 A
  • DE 102004038640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006022829A1] CO<sub

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/00 (2006.01); F25B 1/10 (2006.01); F25B 41/04 (2006.01); F25B 5/02 (2006.01); F25B 40/04 (2006.01); F25B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 1/10 (2013.01); F25B 40/06 (2013.01); F25B 41/04 (2013.01); F25B 5/02 (2013.01); F25B 40/02 (2013.01); F25B 40/04 (2013.01); F25B 49/022 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2400/075 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01); F25B 2400/22 (2013.01); F25B 2400/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0431797 A1
  • [X] JP S6164526 A 19860402 - NIPPON DENSO CO
  • [X] US 5103650 A 19920414 - JASTER HEINZ [US]
  • [X] JP S5523859 A 19800220 - TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO
  • [X] JP H01318860 A 19891225 - TOSHIBA CORP
  • [A] US 2585908 A 19520219 - MATTIAS BACKSTROM SIGURD
  • [A] JP 2003254661 A 20030910 - TOSHIBA CORP
  • [Y] GEBHARDT D ET AL: "ENTWICKLUNG EINER TRANSKRITISCHEN ZWEISTUFIGEN SUPERMARKTKAELTEANLAGE FUER TIEF- UND NORMALKUEHLUNG (2)//DEVELOPMENT OF A SUPERMARKET TRANSCRITICAL MULTISTAGE REFRIGERATING PLANT FOR CHILLING AND FREEZING", KAELTE UND KLIMATECHNIK, GENTNER, STUTTGART, DE, vol. 56, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 54 - 65, XP008028730, ISSN: 0343-2246
  • [A] SCHIESARO P ET AL: "DEVELOPMENT OF A TWO STAGE CO2 SUPERMARKET SYSTEM", IIR CONFERENCE. NEW TECHNOLOGIES IN COMMERCIAL REFRIGERATION, XX, XX, 22 July 2002 (2002-07-22), pages 1 - 10, XP001169091

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006022829 A1 20060302; WO 2006022829 A8 20070322; AT 544992 T 20120215; AU 2005270472 A1 20060216; AU 2005270472 B2 20110106; AU 2005278162 A1 20060302; CN 100507402 C 20090701; CN 100582603 C 20100120; CN 101014815 A 20070808; CN 101040153 A 20070919; CN 101713596 A 20100526; CN 101713596 B 20120808; DK 1794510 T3 20120521; DK 1895246 T3 20170306; EP 1782001 A1 20070509; EP 1782001 B1 20161130; EP 1789732 A1 20070530; EP 1789732 B1 20110323; EP 1794510 A1 20070613; EP 1794510 B1 20120208; EP 1895246 A2 20080305; EP 1895246 A3 20090211; EP 1895246 B1 20161123; EP 1895246 B3 20180502; EP 2244040 A2 20101027; EP 2244040 A3 20111012; EP 2264385 A2 20101222; EP 2264385 A3 20111019; EP 2264385 B1 20180411; HK 1101199 A1 20120615; HK 1144011 A1 20130516; KR 20070046847 A 20070503; KR 20070050046 A 20070514; NO 20071229 A 20070306; RU 2007107807 A 20080920; RU 2362096 C2 20090720; US 2008078203 A1 20080403; US 2008104981 A1 20080508; US 7644593 B2 20100112; US 8113008 B2 20120214

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG CH AELM] LIMITATION AGREED

2018-05-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-03-21 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 2; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20170907

2018-03-14 [LIM5] LIMITATION WITHDRAWN

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20161216

2018-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-02-16 [REG DE R056] PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST

- Document: DE 502005015435

2017-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-11-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170824

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-25 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20170907

2017-09-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: BESCHRAENKUNGANTRAG OHNE RECHTSFOLGE ABGESCHLOSSEN:DER ANTRAG AUF BESCHRAENKUNG WURDE ZURUECKGENOMMEN

2017-09-27 [LIM5] LIMITATION WITHDRAWN

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD; CHANGE OF DECISION ON REQUEST FOR LIMITATION OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-09-07 [REG DE R055] PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502005015435

2017-08-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170223

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-08-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502005015435

2017-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-07-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-07-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-07-26 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD; CHANGE OF DECISION ON REQUEST FOR LIMITATION OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502005015435

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-07-11 [REG DE R056] PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST

- Document: DE 502005015435

2017-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-05-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170323

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-04-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-04-28 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-03-29 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-03-27 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-03-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2017-03-08 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-03-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161123

2017-01-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005015435

2016-12-16 [REG DE R055] PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502005015435

2016-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 848290 T

- Effective date: 20161215

2016-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2016-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-11-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1789732 P

2016-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-08-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160718

2013-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090807

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 9/00 20060101AFI20080129BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 41/04 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 1/10 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2008-03-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1789732 P

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR