Global Patent Index - EP 1898794 A4

EP 1898794 A4 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USE WITH DOPPLER MEASUREMENTS IN MEDICAL APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USE WITH DOPPLER MEASUREMENTS IN MEDICAL APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DOPPLER-MESSUNGEN IN MEDIZINISCHEN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF UTILISABLES AVEC DES MESURES DOPPLER DANS DES APPLICATIONS MEDICALES

Publication

EP 1898794 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06745145 A

Priority

  • IL 2006000688 W
  • US 69009605 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006134595A2] A novel method and apparatus are presented for use in analyzing and presenting Doppler data in a Doppler ultrasound system. At least one distance range from an ultrasound transducer along an ultrasound beam is controlled. This at least one distance range includes a plurality of successive locations between a first distance along the ultrasound beam and a second distance along the ultrasound beam. A Doppler signal spectrum representative of the plurality of locations within said at least one distance range is displayed in at least one display window, respectively.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/586 (2013.01); A61B 8/06 (2013.01); A61B 8/463 (2013.01); G01S 7/52058 (2013.01); G01S 7/52074 (2013.01); G01S 15/582 (2013.01); G01S 7/6209 (2013.01); G01S 7/6281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006134595 A2 20061221; WO 2006134595 A3 20070621; CN 101277649 A 20081001; EP 1898794 A2 20080319; EP 1898794 A4 20090225; JP 2008543415 A 20081204; KR 101247520 B1 20130326; KR 20080057216 A 20080624

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1118692

2010-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090507

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090127

2009-02-20 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1118692

2008-09-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-04-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR