Global Patent Index - EP 1902128 A4

EP 1902128 A4 2009-02-25 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING TISSUE GRAFTS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING TISSUE GRAFTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEWEBETRANSPLANTATEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET MÉTHODES DE PRÉPARATION DE GREFFES DE TISSUS

Publication

EP 1902128 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06787137 A

Priority

  • US 2006027191 W
  • US 69795405 P
  • US 31428105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007009036A2] The invention provides automated apparatus and methods for manufacturing implantable tissue grafts in an operating room setting, preferably utilizing autologous adipose tissue cells for preparing vascular grafts. The automated apparatus includes media and tissue dissociating chemical reservoirs, filters, a cell separator and a perfusion flow loop through a biochamber which supports a graft substrate. The present invention further provides methods for using the tissue grafts and cell samples prepared by the devices described herein in a multitude of therapies including revascularization, regeneration and reconstruction of tissues and organs, as well as treatment and prevention of diseases. The invention also provides methods biochamber configurations for applying a sustained low pressure gradient across a permeable scaffold material using a media containing cells to be deposited on the scaffold for the production of tissue grafts, including, but not limited to, vascular grafts.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 3/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/071 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0697 (2013.01); C12M 21/08 (2013.01); C12M 25/14 (2013.01); C12M 29/10 (2013.01); C12M 45/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007009036 A2 20070118; WO 2007009036 A3 20070531; WO 2007009036 A9 20070315; AU 2006268129 A1 20070118; CA 2615208 A1 20070118; EP 1902128 A2 20080326; EP 1902128 A4 20090225; JP 2009501562 A 20090122

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141223

2015-02-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1119202

2013-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130115

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-27 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1119202

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12M 3/00 20060101AFI20090119BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOSSMAN, ERIK

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLAND, EUGENE

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALLER, CHRISTIAN, L.

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAUCH, CRAIG, A.

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILLIAMS, STUART, K.

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOSNIK, PAUL

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGLAND, CHRIS

2008-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CANNON, THOMAS, F.

2008-04-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR