Global Patent Index - EP 1903914 B1

EP 1903914 B1 2009-02-18 - REMOVABLE SEAT CUSHION

Title (en)

REMOVABLE SEAT CUSHION

Title (de)

ABNEHMBARES SITZPOLSTER

Title (fr)

COUSSIN DE SIEGE AMOVIBLE

Publication

EP 1903914 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 06774255 A

Priority

  • US 2006025314 W
  • US 18013405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007008436A2] A seat cushion is disclosed that can be easily attached to, and removed from, a chair or seat utilizing a mesh seat bottom. The removable seat cushion includes a collection of downwardly extending engagement members that engage the mesh upon insertion through voids in the mesh.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/18 (2006.01); A47C 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/021 (2013.01); A47C 7/18 (2013.01); A47C 7/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007008436 A2 20070118; WO 2007008436 A3 20070503; CN 101166445 A 20080423; DE 602006005247 D1 20090402; EP 1903914 A2 20080402; EP 1903914 B1 20090218; US 2005269850 A1 20051208

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110629

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602006005247

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110629

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110629

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006005247 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-09-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080523

2008-04-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071013

2008-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT