Global Patent Index - EP 1904110 A4

EP 1904110 A4 2009-02-11 - TARGETING CELLS WITH ALTERED MICRORNA EXPRESSION

Title (en)

TARGETING CELLS WITH ALTERED MICRORNA EXPRESSION

Title (de)

TARGETING VON ZELLEN MIT VERÄNDERTER MICRORNA-EXPRESSION

Title (fr)

CIBLAGE DE CELLULES PRÉSENTANT UN MICROARN D'EXPRESSION MODIFIÉE

Publication

EP 1904110 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06741167 A

Priority

  • AU 2006000750 W
  • US 68754705 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006128245A1] The present invention relates to a method of modulating development of a cell. The method includes the step of introducing into the cell a nucleic acid with the capacity to modulate development of the cell, the nucleic acid including a target site for binding of a microRNA, wherein the activity and/or concentration of the microRNA in the cell results in a level of activity and/or concentration of the nucleic acid in the cell sufficient to modulate development of the cell.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/11 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/0058 (2013.01); C12N 15/111 (2013.01); C12N 15/635 (2013.01); C12N 15/85 (2013.01); C12N 2310/14 (2013.01); C12N 2310/141 (2013.01); C12N 2320/30 (2013.01); C12N 2320/50 (2013.01); C12N 2800/107 (2013.01); C12N 2830/50 (2013.01); C12N 2830/85 (2013.01); C12N 2840/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 2005078096 A2 20050825 - UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al
  • [X] JOHN BINO ET AL: "Human MicroRNA targets.", PLOS BIOLOGY NOV 2004, vol. 2, no. 11, November 2004 (2004-11-01), pages e363, XP009109996, ISSN: 1545-7885
  • [X] MANSFIELD JENNIFER H ET AL: "MicroRNA-responsive 'sensor' transgenes uncover Hox-like and other developmentally regulated patterns of vertebrate microRNA expression", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, US, vol. 36, no. 10, 1 October 2004 (2004-10-01), pages 1079 - 1083, XP002394622, ISSN: 1061-4036
  • See also references of WO 2006128245A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006128245 A1 20061207; AU 2006254732 A1 20061207; CA 2610702 A1 20061207; EP 1904110 A1 20080402; EP 1904110 A4 20090211; EP 2377559 A1 20111019; JP 2008541737 A 20081127

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120323

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-02-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 48/00 20060101AFI20070202BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/68 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/48 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/11 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2008-09-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOUTHERN ADELAIDE HEALTH SERVICE - FLINDERS MEDICA

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR