Global Patent Index - EP 1905934 A3

EP 1905934 A3 2009-02-25 - Module for a glass curtain wall

Title (en)

Module for a glass curtain wall

Title (de)

Modul für eine Glasvorhangfassade

Title (fr)

Module de mur-rideau en verre

Publication

EP 1905934 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07114126 A

Priority

IT PD20060352 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1905934A2] A glass curtain wall module, comprising: a glass pane (11); supporting bodies (12), which are arranged along at least two mutually opposite edges of the glass pane (11) and at the inner face of the glass pane (11), the supporting bodies (12) being fixed to the glass pane (11) by interposing structural adhesive material (14); elements (18) for fixing the supporting bodies (12) of the glass pane (11) to a supporting structure; means (21) for rotational articulation, which are adapted to couple the fixing elements (18) to the supporting bodies (12) of the glass pane (11).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/56 (2006.01); E04B 2/88 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5427 (2013.01); E04F 13/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1905934 A2 20080402; EP 1905934 A3 20090225; IT PD20060352 A1 20080322

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FAVARO, SERGIO

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 3/56 20060101AFI20080125BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 2/88 20060101ALI20090121BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 13/08 20060101ALI20090121BHEP

2008-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU