Global Patent Index - EP 1916212 A3

EP 1916212 A3 2009-02-18 - Product driven in- line glue dot applicator and method for using same

Title (en)

Product driven in- line glue dot applicator and method for using same

Title (de)

Produktgetriebener Inline-Leimpunktapplikator und Verwendungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Applicateur de pastille de colle continue pour produit et son procédé d'utilisation

Publication

EP 1916212 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07254148 A

Priority

  • US 58869506 A
  • US 73876807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1916212A2] A method and apparatus (100) are provided, for transferring pressure-sensitive adhesive segments (102) from a rolled flexible carrier release tape (126) to a workpiece, by directing the flexible carrier release tape (126) to a dispensing member (140) attached to a pivotable arm (106), and pivoting the arm (106) in such a manner that the dispensing member (140) clamps the flexible carrier release tape (126) against the workpiece. With the carrier release tape (126) clamped against the workpiece, relative linear movement between the carrier release tape (126) and the workpiece is initiated, in such a manner that the relative motion unrolls the flexible carrier tape (126) and moves one or more pressure-sensitive adhesive segments (102) into pressurized contact with the workpiece so that the one or more pressure-sensitive segments (102) are transferred from the flexible carrier tape (126) to the workpiece.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/002 (2013.01); B65H 2701/19402 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1916212 A2 20080430; EP 1916212 A3 20090218; CA 2607373 A1 20080427; US 2008099510 A1 20080501

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-12-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS