Global Patent Index - EP 1923645 A4

EP 1923645 A4 2009-02-18 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REFRIGERATING MACHINE EMPLOYING NON-AZEOTROPIC REFRIGERANT

Title (en)

CONTROL SYSTEM FOR REFRIGERATING MACHINE EMPLOYING NON-AZEOTROPIC REFRIGERANT

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE EIN NICHT AZEOTROPES KÄLTEMITTEL EINSETZENDE KÄLTEMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINE RÉFRIGÉRANTE EMPLOYANT UN RÉFRIGÉRANT NON AZÉOTROPE

Publication

EP 1923645 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06766729 A

Priority

  • JP 2006311961 W
  • JP 2005260151 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1923645A1] Issues to be solved On a refrigerator using non-azeotropic refrigerants, its cooling-capability is improved at starting up and/or at going up interior room temperature. Means as solution On a single-stage type refrigerating system using non-azeotropic refrigerant, composing with a compressor (1), a condenser (2), and an evaporator (10), heat exchanging between returned-refrigerant from evaporator and high-pressure refrigerant toward evaporator, electromagnetic valves (5-1 to 5-4) of capillary tubes (6-1 to 6-4) as expansion valves of evaporator are fully open, at moments of large load needed such as at starting up, the system is controlled flux of refrigerant gas and pressure of it by closing them one by the other corresponding to going down of interior room temperature. As the state of interior room temperature is high and low boiling point constituent is not condensed, cooling capability of high boiling point refrigerant performs in maximum.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/006 (2013.01); F25B 41/06 (2013.01); F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F25B 2341/0661 (2013.01); F25B 2500/26 (2013.01); F25B 2600/2513 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1923645 A1 20080521; EP 1923645 A4 20090218; CN 101128707 A 20080220; JP 2007071468 A 20070322; KR 20080042035 A 20080514; TW 200710355 A 20070316; TW I310827 B 20090611; US 2008302116 A1 20081211; WO 2007029390 A1 20070315

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100422

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090121

2008-10-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-10-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB LI

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB LI