Global Patent Index - EP 1924369 B1

EP 1924369 B1 2010-02-24 - METHOD FOR LUBRICATING AND COOLING ROLLERS AND METAL STRIPS ON ROLLING IN PARTICULAR ON COLD ROLLING OF METAL STRIPS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR LUBRICATING AND COOLING ROLLERS AND METAL STRIPS ON ROLLING IN PARTICULAR ON COLD ROLLING OF METAL STRIPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHMIEREN UND KÜHLEN VON WALZEN UND METALLBAND BEIM WALZEN, INSBESONDERE BEIM KALTWALZEN VON METALLBÄNDERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LUBRIFIER ET REFROIDIR LES CYLINDRES ET LA BANDE METALLIQUE LORS DU LAMINAGE, NOTAMMENT LORS DU LAMINAGE A FROID DE BANDES METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 1924369 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06791668 A

Priority

  • EP 2006008359 W
  • DE 102005042020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2618836C] The invention relates to a method for lubricating and cooling rollers (3,4,5,6) and metal strips (2) on rolling in particular, on cold rolling of metal strips (2), wherein, on the inlet side (7a) a minimal amount of pure lubricant (9) without a high water content is continuously supplied in an online controlled manner with a controlled viscosity and lubricity depending on a number of process data measurements (23) by means of a physical computer model (22) and the equivalent process data measurements (23) from the outlet side (8a) are also used online by the physical computer model (22).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/32 (2006.01); B21B 37/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/32 (2013.01); B21B 37/44 (2013.01); B21B 3/00 (2013.01); B21B 27/10 (2013.01); B21B 37/26 (2013.01); B21B 45/0209 (2013.01); B21B 45/0218 (2013.01); B21B 45/0251 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005042020 A1 20070308; AT 458560 T 20100315; AU 2006286797 A1 20070308; AU 2006286797 B2 20101125; BR PI0614932 A2 20110426; CA 2618836 A1 20070308; CA 2618836 C 20120515; CN 101253007 A 20080827; DE 502006006271 D1 20100408; EG 24894 A 20101213; EP 1924369 A1 20080528; EP 1924369 B1 20100224; ES 2340320 T3 20100601; JP 2009506891 A 20090219; JP 5164844 B2 20130321; KR 20080039339 A 20080507; MX 2008000869 A 20080326; MY 145255 A 20120113; RU 2008112666 A 20091010; RU 2426613 C2 20110820; TW 200722197 A 20070616; TW I359704 B 20120311; US 2009282884 A1 20091119; US 8001820 B2 20110823; WO 2007025682 A1 20070308; ZA 200709988 B 20080827

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-12-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AG, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 502006006271

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006006271

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2012-09-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100825

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-11-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100524

2010-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-10-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100525

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-10-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-09-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-08-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-08-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-07-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-07-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-07-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20100224

2010-06-02 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2340320 T3

2010-04-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006006271 P 20100408

2010-03-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2010-02-26 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071102

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR