Global Patent Index - EP 1924984 B1

EP 1924984 B1 2009-02-25 - DISPLAY SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION DEVICE

Title (en)

DISPLAY SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION DEVICE

Title (de)

ANZEIGESYSTEM INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE INDUSTRIELLE AUTOMATISIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE NOTAMMENT POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AUTOMATISATION INDUSTRIEL

Publication

EP 1924984 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06792650 A

Priority

  • EP 2006064962 W
  • DE 102005043310 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007031366A1] The invention relates to a display system (1) which is used, in particular, in an industrial automation device. The display system has a first display panel (10) which can be electrically operated and is transparent at least in parts and/or at times. The display system (1) also has a second display panel (12), wherein the first display panel (10) is positioned with respect to the second display panel (12) in such a manner that the second display panel (12) can be viewed through the first display panel (10). The second display panel is, in particular, a nameplate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/35 (2006.01); G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09F 13/22 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/22 (2013.01); G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09F 9/35 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007031366 A1 20070322; CN 101263541 A 20080910; CN 101263541 B 20120502; DE 102005043310 A1 20070503; DE 102005043310 B4 20071004; DE 502006002970 D1 20090409; EP 1924984 A1 20080528; EP 1924984 B1 20090225; JP 2009508151 A 20090226; JP 4999848 B2 20120815; US 2009091513 A1 20090409; US 8493285 B2 20130723

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006002970

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006002970

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002970 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2008-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080208

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE