Global Patent Index - EP 1925222 A3

EP 1925222 A3 2009-02-18 - Personal protection system comprising a helmet, a hood and assembly for aligning the hood with the helmet

Title (en)

Personal protection system comprising a helmet, a hood and assembly for aligning the hood with the helmet

Title (de)

Personenschutzsystem mit einem Helm und einer Haube sowie Anordnung zur Zusammenfügung des Helms mit der Haube

Title (fr)

Système de protection personnelle comportant un casque, une capuche et un ensemble pour aligner la capuche et le casque

Publication

EP 1925222 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08001739 A

Priority

  • EP 01908633 A
  • US 17695800 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1925222A2] A positioning and supporting system for assisting a single user in self-gowning as the user maintains sterility, said positioning and supporting system comprising: a helmet assembly (12) adapted to be mounted on a head of the user and including a fan module (46) for distributing air about the head of the user, said helmet assembly (12) including a base section (32) and a facial section (40) extending from said base section (32) to define a facial opening; a hood (92) for covering said base section (32) of said helmet assembly (12); a face shield (96) mounted to said hood (92) to cover said facial opening thereby permitting the user to view through said hood (92), said face shield (96) including a mounting mechanism (108) to support said face shield (96) on said helmet assembly (12); and said helmet assembly (12) including a mounting device (112) interlocking with said mounting mechanism (108) on said face shield (96) to automatically align said face shield (96) over said facial opening and to support said hood (92) and said face shield (96) thereby assisting the single user in self-gowning while maintaining a relative position between said face shield (96) and said helmet assembly (12) as the user maintains sterility.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/11 (2006.01); A42B 3/28 (2006.01); A42B 3/18 (2006.01); A62B 18/04 (2006.01); A62B 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/1153 (2013.01); A42B 3/286 (2013.01); A62B 18/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1925222 A2 20080528; EP 1925222 A3 20090218; EP 1925222 B1 20120822

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2015-06-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-09-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60147027

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-08-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121203

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121224

2013-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121123

2013-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2012-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH

2012-12-12 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-12-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-10-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60147027

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 571422 T

- Effective date: 20120915

2012-09-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-08-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1286604 P

2012-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-02-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GOWN HELMET ASSEMBLY

2009-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIAZ, LUIS A.

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HENNIGES, BRUCE D.

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WASSERMAN, MARK A.

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STALEY, KAREN L.

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080130

2008-05-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1286604 P

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR