Global Patent Index - EP 1928802 B8

EP 1928802 B8 2017-10-11 - POWDER REDISPERSIBLE IN WATER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

POWDER REDISPERSIBLE IN WATER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

IN WASSER REDISPERGIERBARES PULVER, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

POUDRE REDISPERSIBLE DANS L'EAU, PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARER ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1928802 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 06792203 A

Priority

  • EP 2006009191 W
  • EP 05021009 A
  • EP 06792203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1767506A1] Water-redispersible powder for reducing efflorescence in hydraulic binder systems comprises an organic compound (I) with a (partially) saturated cyclic group having a melting point of -20 to 250[deg]C and a molecular weight of 100-10000, and a water-soluble organic polymeric protective colloid (II) that forms a stable dispersion in water. The (I):(II) weight ratio is 95:5 to 5:95. Independent claims are also included for: (1) process (P1) for producing a powder as above by dispersing (I) and (II) in water and drying the dispersion; (2) process (P2) as above in which the drying step is omitted; (3) use of an aqueous dispersion produced by P2 for reducing efflorescence in hydraulic binder systems, where the dispersion comprises 5-95 parts by weight of rosin or abietic, sylvic, neoabietic, levopimaric, pimaric, isopimaric or palustric acid and 5-95 parts by weight of polyvinyl alcohol or polyvinylpyrrolidone and 0-50 parts by weight of a silane or siloxane component and has a solids content of 10-70 wt.%, an average particle size of 0.05-50 mu m and a Brookfield viscosity of 100-50000 mPas at 23[deg]C and 20 rpm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 24/34 (2006.01); C04B 40/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 24/34 (2013.01); C04B 24/2623 (2013.01); C04B 40/0039 (2013.01); C04B 40/0042 (2013.01); C04B 2103/0057 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00517 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00672 (2013.01); C04B 2111/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 40/0039 + C04B 24/2623 + C04B 24/34 + C04B 24/42
  2. C04B 40/0042 + C04B 24/2652 + C04B 24/34 + C04B 24/42
  3. C04B 40/0042 + C04B 24/10 + C04B 24/34
  4. C04B 40/0042 + C04B 24/08 + C04B 24/14 + C04B 24/26 + C04B 24/34 + C04B 24/42 + C04B 2103/65
  5. C04B 40/0042 + C04B 14/04 + C04B 14/06 + C04B 14/26 + C04B 24/26 + C04B 24/2623 + C04B 24/34 + C04B 24/383 + C04B 28/02 + C04B 2103/10 + C04B 2103/20 + C04B 2103/30 + C04B 2103/44

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1767506 A1 20070328; BR PI0616718 A2 20110628; CA 2623872 A1 20070405; CA 2623872 C 20160913; CN 101272994 A 20080924; CN 101272994 B 20130403; EA 018835 B1 20131129; EA 200800945 A1 20080829; EA 201300720 A1 20140228; EP 1928802 A1 20080611; EP 1928802 B1 20170823; EP 1928802 B8 20171011; EP 2371792 A1 20111005; JP 2009510200 A 20090312; JP 5557447 B2 20140723; US 2009223416 A1 20090910; US 2012264861 A1 20121018; US 2014316029 A1 20141023; US 9353005 B2 20160531; WO 2007036324 A1 20070405

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL B.V., NL

- Document: AT 921152 T

- Effective date: 20170912

2017-09-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006015636

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KASCHE AND PARTNER AG, CH

2017-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 921152 T

- Effective date: 20170915

2017-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2017-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-04-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170321

2011-09-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2011-08-03 [DAC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF: (DELETED)

2008-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2008-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR