Global Patent Index - EP 1930400 A4

EP 1930400 A4 2009-02-18 - LUBRICANT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

LUBRICANT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

SCHMIERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE

Publication

EP 1930400 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06810740 A

Priority

  • JP 2006319293 W
  • JP 2005284217 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1930400A1] The present invention provides a lubricating composition, particularly a grease composition and a lubricating oil composition, containing an aralkylated diphenylamine and a phenol compound having a molecular weight of not less than 340 which are compounded into a base oil. The lubricating composition is hardly decomposed or volatilized even at high temperatures and has a long oxidation life so that the lubricating characteristics thereof can be maintained for a long period of time.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/06 (2006.01); C10M 115/08 (2006.01); C10M 117/00 (2006.01); C10M 129/10 (2006.01); C10M 129/14 (2006.01); C10M 129/76 (2006.01); C10M 133/12 (2006.01); C10M 169/06 (2006.01); C10N 20/00 (2006.01); C10N 20/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/08 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/06 (2013.01); C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/106 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1426 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2215/006 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/1026 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10N 2220/00 (2013.01); C10N 2220/021 (2013.01); C10N 2230/00 (2013.01); C10N 2230/06 (2013.01); C10N 2230/08 (2013.01); C10N 2230/10 (2013.01); C10N 2230/74 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2250/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2219/046 + C10N 2210/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1930400 A1 20080611; EP 1930400 A4 20090218; EP 1930400 B1 20110803; CN 101278036 A 20081001; CN 101278036 B 20110420; JP 5249584 B2 20130731; JP WO2007037322 A1 20090409; US 2009170738 A1 20090702; WO 2007037322 A1 20070405

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006023551

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120504

2011-09-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006023551

- Effective date: 20110929

2011-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2011-03-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 141/06 20060101AFI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 169/06 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 115/08 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 117/00 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 129/10 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 129/14 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 129/76 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 133/12 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 20/00 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 20/04 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 30/06 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 30/08 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 30/10 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/00 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/02 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/04 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/08 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2011-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 50/10 20060101ALI20110204BHEP

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-02-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-10-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR