Global Patent Index - EP 1936285 B1

EP 1936285 B1 2009-02-11 - Cooking appliance with heat storage and operation method therefore

Title (en)

Cooking appliance with heat storage and operation method therefore

Title (de)

Gargerät mit Wärmespeicher und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson avec accumulateur de chaleur et procédé d'utilisation

Publication

EP 1936285 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06025272 A

Priority

EP 06025272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1936285A1] A cooking appliance has a cooking space (40), a blower (50) and an energy store (10) i.e. in the form of a heat store, which is joined to the cooking space (40) via at least one feed-line (20) for conducting gas from the energy store (10) into the cooking space (40). The feed-line (20) is mounted on the cooking space (40) so that the opening of the feed-line (20) runs to the cooking space (40) in a region of reduced pressure produced by the blower (50), so that gas (170,180) streams into the blower for mixing with the cooking space atmosphere (130) during operation of the blower. An independent claim is included for a method for coupling hot gas from the energy store into a cooking space.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1936285 A1 20080625; EP 1936285 B1 20090211; DE 502006002850 D1 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006002850

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002850 P 20090326

2009-03-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS