Global Patent Index - EP 1939441 A3

EP 1939441 A3 2009-02-04 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Kraftstoffinjektor

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant

Publication

EP 1939441 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07119031 A

Priority

DE 102006060593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1939441A2] A control valve (6) has a control sleeve (10) with balanced force to move between two valve positions, to block a connection between a connecting channel (14) coming from a control space (2) and running into a pressurized space (15) and a low-pressure side (7) in its closed position and to release this connection in its valve position opened and pushed towards an injector needle (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0015 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/0031 (2013.01); F02M 63/0042 (2013.01); F02M 63/0043 (2013.01); F02M 63/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1939441 A2 20080702; EP 1939441 A3 20090204; DE 102006060593 A1 20080626

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS