Global Patent Index - EP 1940706 B1

EP 1940706 B1 2017-10-25 - WASTE BIN HAVING COMPACTING MEANS

Title (en)

WASTE BIN HAVING COMPACTING MEANS

Title (de)

ABFALLBEHÄLTER MIT VERDICHTUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

POUBELLE DOTÉE DE MOYENS DE COMPACTAGE

Publication

EP 1940706 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05797025 A

Priority

SE 2005001627 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007050003A1] The present invention relates to a waste bin (1) for used paper towels or the like waste having an upper part including a rear wall (2), two side walls (4.5), and a front wall (3), which upper part include compacting means (6,7). According to the invention the compacting means (6,7) in its rest position divides the inner space of the waste bin (1) into an upper (8) and lower compartment (9) and are movable to open and re-close an opening into a lower part of the waste bin.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1405 (2013.01); B30B 9/3082 (2013.01); B65F 1/1426 (2013.01); B65F 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007050003 A1 20070503; AU 2005337686 A1 20070503; BR PI0520653 A2 20090519; CA 2626146 A1 20070503; CL 2006002933 A1 20080125; CN 101291860 A 20081022; CN 101291860 B 20120523; DK 1940706 T3 20180102; EP 1940706 A1 20080709; EP 1940706 B1 20171025; ES 2652552 T3 20180205; US 2008282911 A1 20081120; US 7874247 B2 20110125

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 939688 T

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20171009

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2652552 T3

- Effective date: 20180205

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20171219

2017-12-13 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2017-12-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005052949

2017-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 939688 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170711

2017-07-26 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIDEHAELL, EMMA

2017-03-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170224

2013-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130328

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080310

2008-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR