EP 1941509 A4 20111116 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING/DECODING
Title (en)
METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING/DECODING
Title (de)
METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KODIEREN/DEKODIEREN
Title (fr)
PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE / DECODAGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- KR 2006004125 W 20061013
- US 72565505 P 20051013
- US 72565205 P 20051013
- US 72623005 P 20051014
- US 75746306 P 20060110
- US 78717306 P 20060330
- US 78873606 P 20060404
- US 78987606 P 20060407
- KR 20060066557 A 20060714
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2007043829A1] The present invention relates to a multimedia data encoding/decoding method and apparatus. The encoding method includes generating a data area including a plurality of media data areas; generating a plurality of track areas corresponding to the plurality of media data areas, respectively; and generating an animation area including at least one of grouping information on an animation effect, opacity effect information, size information on an image to which the animation effect is to be applied, and geometrical transform effect information. According to the present invention, the multimedia data encoding/decoding method and apparatus has an effect of being capable of constructing a slide show by only a small amount of multimedia data. Thus, a time taken to process and transmit the multimedia data can reduce.
IPC 8 full level
G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G11B 27/034 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06F 16/48 (2018.12); G06F 16/9537 (2018.12); G11B 27/034 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 27/322 (2013.01); G11B 2220/20 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [I] US 6369835 B1 20020409 - LIN TONY HONGTONG [US]
- [I] EP 1376406 A2 20040102 - MICROSOFT CORP [US]
- [A] EP 1302900 A1 20030416 - SHARP KK [JP]
- [A] WO 9964944 A2 19991216 - MICROSOFT CORP [US]
- [A] EP 1018840 A2 20000712 - CANON KK [JP]
- [A] WO 0195632 A2 20011213 - GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al
- [A] US 6037983 A 20000314 - AU PETER H [US], et al
- [A] US 2004220926 A1 20041104 - LAMKIN ALLAN B [US], et al
- [A] WO 9937072 A2 19990722 - APPLE COMPUTER [US]
- [A] APPLE COMPUTER ET AL: "QuickTime File Format", 1 March 2001 (2001-03-01), pages 1 - 274, XP002588828, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://developer.apple.com/standards/qtff-2001.pdf> [retrieved on 20100621]
- [A] "INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC 14496-12 Information technology Coding of audio-visual objects Part 12: ISO base media file format", INTERNET CITATION, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 1 - 84, XP007914375, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.iso.org/iso/iso_catalogue/catalogue_ics/catalogue_detail_i cs.htm?csnumber=41828> [retrieved on 20100811]
- [A] SINGER D ET AL: "ISO/IEC 14496-1/PDAM7 USE OF AVC IN MPEG-4 SYSTEMS AND THE MP4 FILE FORMAT", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC, XX, XX, 26 July 2002 (2002-07-26), pages I - VI,01, XP001074666
- See references of WO 2007043829A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2007043829 A1 20070419; EP 1941509 A1 20080709; EP 1941509 A4 20111116
DOCDB simple family (application)
KR 2006004125 W 20061013; EP 06799203 A 20061013