Global Patent Index - EP 1948360 B1

EP 1948360 B1 2009-02-11 - ROLLER MILL

Title (en)

ROLLER MILL

Title (de)

WÄLZMÜHLE

Title (fr)

BROYEUR A ROULEAUX

Publication

EP 1948360 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06806404 A

Priority

  • EP 2006010101 W
  • DE 102005054209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007054191A1] The invention relates to a roller mill which is suitable in particular for dressing ores. To lower the energy requirement for the comminution and classification of a ground product, a classifying device is arranged under the grinding space, is fed the comminuted, ground material under the effect of gravity and classifying air from an annular chamber in the lower region of the grinding bowl and has at least one fine-material discharge and coarse-material discharge.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/001 (2013.01); B02C 2015/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007054191 A1 20070518; AU 2006312782 A1 20070518; AU 2006312782 B2 20101223; BR PI0606535 A2 20090630; CA 2594507 A1 20070518; CA 2594507 C 20120529; CN 101102848 A 20080109; DE 102005054209 A1 20070524; DE 102005054209 B4 20140528; DE 502006002854 D1 20090326; DK 1948360 T3 20090602; EP 1948360 A1 20080730; EP 1948360 B1 20090211; MX 2007009130 A 20071121; RU 2007126382 A 20090227; RU 2374000 C2 20091127; US 2008296422 A1 20081204; US 7690591 B2 20100406; ZA 200705236 B 20080730

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006002854

- Representative's name: WUNDERLICH & HEIM PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-10 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502006002854

- Effective date: 20131027

2014-03-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20131027

2009-12-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: F.L. SMIDTH A/S

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-06-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002854 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2008-12-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2008-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK