Global Patent Index - EP 1950345 B1

EP 1950345 B1 2013-09-11 - PAPERMAKING METHOD AND PAPERMAKING SYSTEM

Title (en)

PAPERMAKING METHOD AND PAPERMAKING SYSTEM

Title (de)

PAPIERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND PAPIERHERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DESTINES A LA FABRICATION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1950345 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 06822028 A

Priority

  • JP 2006321007 W
  • JP 2005309721 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1950345A1] Apapermakingmethod according to this invention is carried out using a paper machine provided with a head box (3) including a cell-structure manifold (30). An aqueous solution (M) containing 0.03 to 0.4 wt % of viscous agent is added to a material pulp slurry (S), and the obtained mixed pulp slurry (MS) is introduced into the manifold (30).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/06 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 21/06 (2013.01); D21H 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1950345 A1 20080730; EP 1950345 A4 20120307; EP 1950345 B1 20130911; AU 2006307310 A1 20070503; AU 2006307310 B2 20100923; BR PI0617919 A2 20110809; BR PI0617919 B1 20180206; CA 2627471 A1 20070503; CA 2627471 C 20131210; CN 101297080 A 20081029; CN 101297080 B 20110406; JP 4839320 B2 20111221; JP WO2007049528 A1 20090430; KR 101321465 B1 20131025; KR 20080068093 A 20080722; RU 2008120194 A 20091210; RU 2413810 C2 20110310; TW 200730697 A 20070816; TW I379931 B 20121221; US 2009250182 A1 20091008; WO 2007049528 A1 20070503

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-09-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006038398

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-06-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006038398

2013-11-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006038398

- Effective date: 20131107

2013-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-05-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130424

2012-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120719

2012-03-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 21/06 20060101AFI20120203BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 17/53 20060101ALI20120203BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 23/04 20060101ALI20120203BHEP

2008-11-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-11-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080502

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT