Global Patent Index - EP 1950720 A3

EP 1950720 A3 2009-02-18 - Apparatus for preventing and warning of drowning

Title (en)

Apparatus for preventing and warning of drowning

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung von oder Warnung vor Überschwemmungen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la prévention ou l'avertissement de noyade

Publication

EP 1950720 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08100223 A

Priority

TW 96101957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1950720A2] There is disclosed an apparatus for preventing and warning of drowning and warning others of the emergency. The apparatus includes a detecting unit for detecting the drowning of a swimmer, a floating unit for floating the swimmer under the control of the detecting unit, a transmitting unit for transmitting a warning signal under the control of the detecting unit and a receiving unit for receiving the warning signal and locating the swimmer. The detecting unit comprises a timer for determining how long the swimmer is underwater. The device can be worn by the swimmer, for example in the form of a pair of goggles.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1950720 A2 20080730; EP 1950720 A3 20090218; TW 200832292 A 20080801

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS