EP 1952629 A4 20111130 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING VISUAL AND VOICE DATA IN DAB/DMB SERVICE SYSTEM
Title (en)
METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING VISUAL AND VOICE DATA IN DAB/DMB SERVICE SYSTEM
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SYNCHRONISIEREN VISUELLER UND SPRACHDATEN IN EINEM DAB/DMB-DIENSTSYSTEM
Title (fr)
METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR SYNCHRONISER DES DONNEES VISUELLES ET VOCALES DANS UN SYSTEME DE SERVICE DAB/DMB
Publication
Application
Priority
- KR 2006004901 W 20061121
- KR 20050111238 A 20051121
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2007058517A1] Provided is a digital broadcasting service, more particularly, a method for providing a Web service that can simultaneously input/output speech data along with visual data by integrating speech Web data with broadcasting Web sites (BWS) provided for a multimedia broadcasting in a digital multimedia broadcasting (DMB) system configured based on a digital audio broadcasting (DAB), and an apparatus thereof . The method for synchronizing visual data with speech data includes the steps of : a) generating a visual Web document; b) generating a speech Web document including synchronization tags related to the visual Web document; and c) identifying the speech Web document and the visual Web document based on a sub-channel or a directory and transmitting the speech Web document and the visual Web document independently.
IPC 8 full level
H04N 7/00 (2011.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04H 60/82 (2008.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
H04H 60/82 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 5/04 (2013.01 - KR); H04N 21/234318 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/242 (2013.01 - KR); H04N 21/43072 (2020.08 - EP KR US); H04N 21/4782 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8106 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8126 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8543 (2013.01 - EP); H04N 21/8547 (2013.01 - EP); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] US 2003182622 A1 20030925 - SIBAL SANDEEP [US], et al
- [X] WO 03067413 A1 20030814 - SAP AG [DE], et al
- [X] US 2004128342 A1 20040701 - MAES STEPHANE H [US], et al
- [XA] US 2003187944 A1 20031002 - JOHNSON GREG [US], et al
- [X] US 2002194388 A1 20021219 - BOLOKER DAVID [US], et al
- [A] US 2001023436 A1 20010920 - SRINIVASAN ANAND [US], et al
- See references of WO 2007058517A1
Citation (examination)
- "Digital Audio Broadcasting (DAB); Multimedia Object Transfer (MOT) protocol; Draft EN 301 234", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, vol. BC, no. V1.2.1, 1 September 1998 (1998-09-01), XP014003046, ISSN: 0000-0001
- AMANN N ET AL: "Multimodal access position paper", INTERNET CITATION, 26 November 2001 (2001-11-26), XP002244151, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.w3.org/2002/mmi/2002/siemens-26nov01.pdf> [retrieved on 20030612]
- "Digital Audio Broadcasting (DAB); Broadcast website; Part 3: TopNews basic profile specification European Broadcasting Union Union Européenne de Radio-Télévision EBUÜER; ETSI TS 101 498-3", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, vol. BC, no. V2.1.1, 1 October 2005 (2005-10-01), XP014032284, ISSN: 0000-0001
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2007058517 A1 20070524; EP 1952629 A1 20080806; EP 1952629 A4 20111130; KR 100862611 B1 20081009; KR 20070053627 A 20070525
DOCDB simple family (application)
KR 2006004901 W 20061121; EP 06823659 A 20061121; KR 20060114402 A 20061120