Global Patent Index - EP 1953479 A3

EP 1953479 A3 2009-02-18 - Device for cooling an electrical device in a turbomachine

Title (en)

Device for cooling an electrical device in a turbomachine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kühlen einer elektrischen Apparatur in einer Strömungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidissement d'un équipement électrique dans une turbomachine

Publication

EP 1953479 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 08290032 A

Priority

FR 0700643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1953479A2] The device has a double circuit type vortex tube (14) i.e. ranque tube, comprising an inlet (18) connected to an element (16) e.g. low pressure compressor of turbomachine (10), and a cool air outlet (24) connected to a heat exchanger (50). The outlet of the tube is connected to an inlet (34) of a secondary circuit of the heat exchanger. The tubes supplies, at the outlet, cool air whose temperature is 50 degree Celsius lower than the temperature of pressurized air supplied at the inlet (18).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/04 (2006.01); H05K 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/04 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1953479 A2 20080806; EP 1953479 A3 20090218; CA 2619146 A1 20080730; CN 101235729 A 20080806; CN 101235729 B 20110928; FR 2911915 A1 20080801; FR 2911915 B1 20110617; JP 2008208830 A 20080911; JP 2013167252 A 20130829; JP 5270181 B2 20130821; RU 2008103373 A 20090810; RU 2465477 C2 20121027; SG 144866 A1 20080828; UA 94912 C2 20110625; US 2008209914 A1 20080904

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150801

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090319

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS